Thomas, Mary (CPSO#: 72397)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Dec 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Dec 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Melbourne, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
South East Toronto Family Health
Team
Suite 105
840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5T2
Phone: (416) 469-6464
Fax: (416) 469-6164
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mary Thomas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 17 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Thomas ( CPSO# 72397 )

Business Address:
South East Toronto Family Health Team
105-840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5T2
Phone Number: (416) 469-6464

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Dec 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY THOMAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Jan 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2000 to 30 Nov 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 2000