Thompson, Courtney Ann (CPSO#: 91022)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham-Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7601
Fax: (905) 472-7621
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Canada
Phone: (905) 813-2200
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Canada
Phone: (416) 340-3675
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. COURTNEY ANN THOMPSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMPSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013