Timol, Shehnaz (CPSO#: 87223)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Oct 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Oct 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Howard University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4129 Lawrence Ave East
Scarborough ON  M1E 2S2
Phone: (416) 439-1991
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Almakki Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Timol ( CPSO# 87223 )
Dr. N. Almakki ( CPSO# 90811 )

Business Address:
4129 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1E 2S2
Phone Number: (416) 439-1991

Business Address:
Unit 403
2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 5E9
Phone Number: (416) 792-0836

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHEHNAZ TIMOL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TIMOL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2009