Ting, Gabriel Tjun-Jiat (CPSO#: 75033)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Nov 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Nov 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:University of Alberta, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2nd Floor
281 Stone Road
Guelph ON  N1G 5J5
Phone: (519) 823-5133
Fax: (519) 827-0255
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gabriel Ting Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 12 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Ting ( CPSO# 75033 )

Business Address:
2nd Floor
281 Stone Road East
Guelph ON  N1G 5J5
Phone Number: (519) 823-5133

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GABRIEL TJUN-JIAT TING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 2003