Tisher, Carolyn Ruth (CPSO#: 79523)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Feb 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Feb 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Healthsource Medical
473 Dupont St
Toronto ON  M6G 1Y6
Phone: (416) 588-1888
Fax: (416) 588-0388
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kent Tisher Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 20 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Tisher ( CPSO# 79523 )
Dr. K. Tisher ( CPSO# 105147)

Business Address:
Trent Hills Family Health Team
119 Isabella Street
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Phone Number: (705) 653-1801

Business Address:
Yonge Wellesley Medical Clinic
491 Church Street
Toronto ON  M5A 1E3
Phone Number: (416) 960-1441

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Nov 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROLYN RUTH TISHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TISHER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Feb 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2006