Tobe, Lauren Evanna (CPSO#: 75921)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jan 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 500
491 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5M 1C7
Phone: (416) 871-9500
Fax: (416) 781-7985
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 406
1371 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Z8
Canada
Phone: (416) 281-9499
Fax: (416) 283-5705
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAUREN EVANNA TOBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOBE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Mar 2001 to 31 Mar 2001
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Jul 2005
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 2004