Tome, Daniel William (CPSO#: 97114)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jan 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 13 Jan 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:COLL OF OSTEOPATHIC MEDICINE & SURGERY, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West Windsor Urgent Care Centre
2055 Huron Church Road
Windsor ON  N9C 2L6
Phone: (519) 255-9185
Fax: (519) 255-9152
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniel Tome Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 17 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Tome ( CPSO# 97114 )

Business Address:
West Windsor Urgent Care Centre
2055 Huron Church Road
Windsor ON  N9C 2L6
Phone Number: (519) 255-9185

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan
USA - Ohio

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Jan 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 12 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jun 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 20 Jun 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jun 2013 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Daniel  William  Tome  may  practise  medicine  independently in emergency
            medicine, only.