Torlakovic, Emina (CPSO#: 92360)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jan 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 05 Jan 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Zagreb, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal University Hospital
Pathology Room 2845
103 Hospital Dr
Saskatoon SK  S7N 0W8
Phone: (306) 655-1633
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Goran Torlakovic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 07 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Torlakovic ( CPSO# 92360 )
Dr. G. Torlakovic ( CPSO# 92659 )

Business Address:
Department of Pathology
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 747-3400


Corporation Name: Dr. Emina Torlakovic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 18 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan
USA - Minnesota

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematological Pathology Effective: 05 Jan 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Jan 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Apr 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 04 Jul 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 07 Apr 2011 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Emina Torlakovic may practise medicine independently in Haematological
            Pathology, only.