Tory, Susan Kathleen (CPSO#: 93388)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
Medical Affairs Office
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 1K3
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Susan Tory Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 07 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Tory ( CPSO# 93388 )

Business Address:
Humber River Hospital
Medical Affairs Office
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN KATHLEEN TORY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TORY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 May 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015