Touma, Naji Joseph (CPSO#: 79664)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Empire 4
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-2492
Fax: (613) 545-1970
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Naji J. Touma Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 28 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Touma ( CPSO# 79664 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Empire 4
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-2492

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAJI JOSEPH TOUMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOUMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

McMaster University, 09 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008