Trottier, Gregory Thomas (CPSO#: 91723)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centenary Hospital Court
Suite 402
2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 5E9
Phone: (647) 350-1155
Fax: (647) 350-1055
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Trottier Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Trottier ( CPSO# 91723 )

Business Address:
Suite 402
2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 5E9
Phone Number: (647) 350-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GREGORY THOMAS TROTTIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TROTTIER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009