Trzcieniecka, Anna Agata (CPSO#: 77325)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jan 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jan 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Wroclaw, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Delhi Community Health Centre
105 Main Street
Delhi ON  N4B 2L8
Phone: (519) 582-2323
Fax: (519) 582-3770
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

16-556 Bryne Drive
Barrie ON  L4N9P6
Canada
Phone: 705-726-2004
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Grand River Community Health Centre
363 Colborne Street
Brantford ON  N3S3N2
Canada
Phone: 519-754-0777 Ext. 255
Fax: 519-754-0727
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04

Port Rowan Medical Centre
1035 Bay Street
Port Rowan ON  N0E 1M0
Canada
Phone: (519) 586-3143
County: Regional Municipality of Haldimand-Norfolk
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anna Trzcieniecka Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 01 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Trzcieniecka ( CPSO# 77325 )

Business Address:
1035 Bay Street
Port Rowan ON  N0E 1M0

Business Address:
Delhi Community Health Centre
105 Main Street
Delhi ON  N4B 2L8
Phone Number: (519) 582-3535

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNA AGATA TRZCIENIECKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRZCIENIECKA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2002 to 30 Mar 2002
Elective Trainee - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Mar 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2003
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Sep 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2005