Tseng, Leo (CPSO#: 84560)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Taunton Surgical Centre
1300 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa ON  L1J 8P5
Phone: 905-721-3271
Fax: 905-721-3273
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital court
Post Acute Specialty Service
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Canada
Phone: 905 576-8711 Ext. 3093
Fax: 905 721-4735
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Leo Tseng Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Tseng ( CPSO# 84560 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
1300 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa ON  L1J 8P5
Phone Number: (905) 721-3271

Business Address:
First Markham Physiotherapy & Rehab
Unit 3
3085 Highway 7 East
Markham ON  L3R 0J5
Phone Number: (905) 940-1777

Business Address:
Physiatry Clinic
Lakeridge Health Whitby
300 Gordon Street South
Whitby ON  L1N 5T2
Phone Number: (905) 668-6831

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEO TSENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSENG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011