Tsui, Simon Yee Tuen (CPSO#: 86934)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: Tsui, Yee Tuen (used until: 27 Oct 2008 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English

Education:Chinese University of Hong Kong, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10-78 Corporate Drive
Scarborough ON  M1H 3G4
Phone: (416) 279-0855 Ext. 245
Fax: (416) 279-0857
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Carefirst Transitional Care Centre
300 Silver Star Boulevard, 3F
Scarborough ON  M1V 0G2
Canada
Phone: 416 5723840
Fax: 416 5723839
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

The Scarborough Hospital
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Canada
Phone: (416) 495-2465
Fax: (416) 495-2420
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

The Scarborough Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Canada
Phone: (416) 431-8101
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Simon Y. T. Tsui Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 29 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Tsui ( CPSO# 86934 )

Business Address:
10 - 78 Corporate Drive
Scarborough ON  M1H 3G4
Phone Number: (416) 479-0855

Business Address:
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W2
Phone Number: (416) 495-2465

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 431-8101

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 23 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SIMON YEE TUEN TSUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSUI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 28 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 29 Jul 2008 to 02 Nov 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 03 Nov 2008 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2009