Turgeon, Eugene William Thomas (CPSO#: 23799)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eugene Turgeon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 31 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Turgeon ( CPSO# 23799 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Medical Records Location

Address: Group Health Centre 240 McNabb St Sault Ste. Marie, ON P6B 1Y5
Date Received: 22 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1972 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018