Turkstra, Timothy Philip (CPSO#: 74907)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Nov 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anaesthesia
LHSC - University Campus Site
Room C3-113
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 35677
Fax: (519) 663-3079
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T. P. Turkstra Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 10 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Turkstra ( CPSO# 74907 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
339 Windermere Road
Room C3-104
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Road
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6000

Business Address:
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 17 Oct 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TIMOTHY PHILIP TURKSTRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TURKSTRA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Jul 2006
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2005