Upadhyay, Amitkumar Shashikant (CPSO#: 89836)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:Gujarat University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
15017 Yonge Street
Aurora ON  L4G 1M5
Phone: (905) 727-4241
Fax: (905) 727-4288
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1110 Finch Ave West
502
North York ON  M3J 2T2
Canada
Phone: (416) 221-4602
Fax: (416) 221-4928
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

suite 320
Carling Ave
Ottawa ON  K2B 7E9
Canada
Phone: 6138297100
Fax: 6138292608
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Upadhyay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 09 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Upadhyay ( CPSO# 89836 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
15017 Yonge Street
Aurora ON  L4G 1M5
Phone Number: (905) 727-4241

Business Address:
502 - 1110 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3J 2T2
Phone Number: (416) 221-4602

Business Address:
320-2249 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2B 7E9
Phone Number: (613) 829-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham-Stouffville,Cottage Hospital Site Uxbridge
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMITKUMAR SHASHIKANT UPADHYAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UPADHYAY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Sep 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2009