Uppal, Navjeet Kaur (CPSO#: 95970)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Calgary, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mississauga Lung Health Centre
Suite 214
89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B2V2
Phone: 9058486079
Fax: 9058588835
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Navjeet Uppal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 12 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Uppal ( CPSO# 95970 )

Business Address:
Suite 214
89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 31 Oct 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAVJEET KAUR UPPAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UPPAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015