Vaidyanathan, Sammy (CPSO#: 94400)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Sep 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 02 Nov 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Academy of Medicine, Warsaw, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sammy Vaidyanathan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 01 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Vaidyanathan ( CPSO# 94400 )

Business Address:
Humber River Regional Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2

Business Address:
2221 Keele Street
Suite 206
Toronto ON  M6M 3Z5

Business Address:
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7

Business Address:
Joseph Brant Hospital
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  October 4, 2018
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On October 5, 2018, Humber River Hospital (HRH) notified the College, pursuant to s.85.5(2) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that Dr. Sammy Vaidyanathan has taken a voluntary one-year leave from his shifts and other duties at HRH, effective October 4, 2018.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 02 Nov 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 02 Nov 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from November 2, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Sammy Vaidyanathan,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Vaidyanathan to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Vaidyanathan has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in all
                  jurisdictions.  

Concerns

Source: Legal Department
Active Date: May 3, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Where a member has been charged with an offence under the Criminal Code of Canada or the Ontario Health Insurance Act and the charge is outstanding and is known to the College, the College By-laws require certain information about the charge to be posted on the register.

The following are outstanding charges against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

It is alleged that Sammy Vaidyanathan:

(1) on or about March 7, 2018 at the City of Burlington having consumed alcohol in such a quantity that the concentration thereof in his blood exceeded 80 milligrams of alcohol in 100 millilitres of blood did operate a motor vehicle, contrary to section 253(1)(b) of the Criminal Code; and

(2) on or about March 7, 2018 at the city of Burlington, did operate a motor vehicle on a highway, to wit: the Queen Elizabeth Way, in a manner that was dangerous to the public contrary to Section 249(1)(a) of the Criminal Code.

Date of charge: March 16, 2018
Place of charge: Milton, ON
Ontario Provincial Police