Valiulis, Aurelia Ona (CPSO#: 95565)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Lithuanian

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 208
190 Wortley Road
London ON  N6C 4Y7
Phone: 519-438-5101
Fax: 519-438-0369
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Valiulis Cool Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 07 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Cool ( CPSO# 95560 )
Dr. A. Valiulis ( CPSO# 95565 )

Business Address:
LHSC - Victoria Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (581) 685-8500

Business Address:
208 - 190 Wortley Road
London ON  N6C 4Y7
Phone Number: (519) 438-5101

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AURELIA ONA VALIULIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VALIULIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2013