Van Heiningen, Willem Pieter Jan (CPSO#: 93537)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jan 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jan 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1180 Queen's Bush Road
PO Box 187
Wellesley ON  N0B 2T0
Phone: (519) 656-9025
Fax: (519) 656-9027
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lutherwood
285 Benjamin Rd
Waterloo ON  N2J 3Z4
Canada
Phone: (519) 884-1470 Ext. 1171
Fax: (519) 886-8479
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

OHCOW
848 Main Street East
Hamilton ON  L8M 1L9
Canada
Phone: (905) 549-2552
Fax: (905) 549-7993
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Region of Waterloo Public Health
2nd Floor
99 Regina Street
Waterloo ON  N2J3A8
Canada
Phone: (519) 883-2000
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLEM PIETER JAN VAN HEININGEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN HEININGEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 07 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2013