Van Houwelingen, Andrew Peter (CPSO#: 82993)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Mar 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Mar 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Thomas Elgin General Hospital
Division of Orthopaedic Surgery
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Phone: (519) 637-8308
Fax: (519) 207-8308
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrew Van Houwelingen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 13 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Van Houwelingen ( CPSO# 82993 )

Business Address:
St Thomas Elgin General Hospital
Division of Orthopaedic Surgery
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Phone Number: (519) 637-8308

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW PETER VAN HOUWELINGEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN HOUWELINGEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 2011