Van Kampen, Janice Yolande (CPSO#: 71470)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Niagara Health System -
St. Catharines Site
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647 Ext. 46495
Fax: (905) 397-1904
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Janice Van Kampen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Van Kampen ( CPSO# 71470 )

Business Address:
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 658-2022

Business Address:
Niagara Health System
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANICE YOLANDE VAN KAMPEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN KAMPEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002