Van Vliet, Aaron James (CPSO#: 82994)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 208
1221 Algonquin Avenue
North Bay ON  P1B 4Y3
Phone: (705) 472-0221
Fax: (705) 472-9686
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aaron Van Vliet Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 21 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Van Vliet ( CPSO# 82994 )

Business Address:
Suite 208
1221 Algonquin Avenue
North Bay ON  P1B 4Y3
Phone Number: (705) 472-0221

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AARON JAMES VAN VLIET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN VLIET is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010