VanderMeer, Rachel Laura (CPSO#: 86569)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jan 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Walker Family Cancer Centre
1200 Fourth Ave
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. VanderMeer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 24 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. VanderMeer ( CPSO# 86569 )

Business Address:
Walker Family Cancer Centre
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 27 Feb 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RACHEL LAURA VANDERMEER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VANDERMEER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 28 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 29 Dec 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 27 Feb 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2012