Vartian, Brian Alex (CPSO#: 90745)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Dec 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Groves Memorial Community Hospital
235 Union Street East
Fergus ON  N1M 1W3
Phone: (519) 843-2010
Fax: (519) 843-7288
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Northumberland Hills Hospital
1000 DePalma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Canada
County: County of Northumberland
Electoral District: 06

University Health Services
J.T. Powell Building
University of Guelph
Guelph ON  N1G 2W1
Canada
Phone: 519-824-4120 Ext. 52131
Fax: 519-821-2308
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vartian Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 18 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Vartian ( CPSO# 90745 )

Business Address:
Groves Memorial Community Hospital
235 Union Street East
Fergus ON  N1M 1W3
Phone Number: (519) 843-2010

Business Address:
1000 DePalma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone Number: (905) 372-6811

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Groves Memorial Community Hospital,Fergus Fergus
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN ALEX VARTIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VARTIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 01 May 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 02 May 2011 to 30 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2011 to 30 Nov 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 2012