Vaughan, Matthew Mountfort (CPSO#: 81714)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 May 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Aug 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sheffield, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Northumberland Hills Hospital
Department of Radiology
1000 De Palma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone: (905) 372-6811
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Vaughan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 25 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Vaughan ( CPSO# 81714 )

Business Address:
Northumberland Hills Hospital
1000 DePalma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone Number: (289) 251-7226

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 05 May 2006 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATTHEW MOUNTFORT VAUGHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAUGHAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Sep 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Mar 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 May 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 Aug 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2007