Vela, Kanna Jeyaverny (CPSO#: 88872)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200B
1105E Kingston Road
Pickering ON  L1V 1B5
Phone: (905) 420-9999
Fax: (905) 420-6458
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Uxbridge Cottage Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
4 Campbell Dr
Uxbridge ON  L9P 1S4
Canada
Phone: (905) 852-9771
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Markham Stouffeville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Canada
Phone: (905) 472-7000
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vela Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 25 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Vela ( CPSO# 88872 )

Business Address:
4 Campbell Drive
Uxbridge ON  L9P 1S4
Phone Number: (905) 852-9771

Business Address:
381 Church Street
P.O. Box 1800
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Business Address:
200B - 1105E Kingston Road
Pickering ON  L1V 1B5
Phone Number: (905) 420-9999

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Markham-Stouffville,Cottage Hospital Site Uxbridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KANNA JEYAVERNY VELA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VELA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2010