Venkat Raghavan, Lakshmikumar (CPSO#: 80445)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Madras, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5118
Fax: (416) 603-6494
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. L.V. Raghavan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 21 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Venkat Raghavan ( CPSO# 80445 )

Business Address:
Department of Anaesthesia
UHN - Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5118

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 31 May 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAKSHMIKUMAR VENKAT RAGHAVAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VENKAT RAGHAVAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2004 to 19 Mar 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 20 Mar 2004 to 31 Jan 2005
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Jul 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2008