Verma, Geetika Ekta (CPSO#: 76377)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 May 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 May 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 201
849 Alexander Court
Peterborough ON  K9J 7H8
Phone: (705) 775-4505
Fax: (705) 775-4506
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aidan Cunniffe and Geetika Verma Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 03 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Cunniffe ( CPSO# 102918)
Dr. G. Verma ( CPSO# 76377 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
849 Alexander Court
Peterborough ON  K9J 7H8
Phone Number: (705) 775-4505

Business Address:
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 12 Sep 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEETIKA EKTA VERMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VERMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 May 2014