Victory, Rahi (CPSO#: 72369)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Queen's University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
8100 Twin Oaks Dr
Windsor ON  N8N 5C2
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

242 Queen Street East
Brampton ON  L6V 1B9
Canada
Phone: 905-457-8558
Fax: 905-457-8118
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Nahal Fertility Program
22-30 Wertheim Court
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 1B9
Canada
Phone: 905-482-3389
Fax: 905-482-3319
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

#106 - 704 Mara Street
Point Edward ON  N7V 1X4
Canada
Phone: 519-542-6512
Fax: 519-542-8831
County: County of Lambton
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rahi Victory Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 27 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Victory ( CPSO# 72369 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Business Address:
Natal Fertility Program
22 - 30 Wertheim Court
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 1L9
Phone Number: (905) 482-3389

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital - Ouellette
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4444

Business Address:
8100 Twin Oaks Drive
Windsor ON  N8N 5C2

Business Address:
106-704 Mara Street
Point Edward ON  N7V 1X4

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare,Tayfour Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAHI VICTORY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VICTORY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2003