Vidal Peralta, Bertha Carolina Roxana Beatriz (CPSO#: 85833)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Sep 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Sep 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad Autonoma De Honduras, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 532
2275 Lakeshore Blvd West
Toronto ON  M8V 3Y3
Phone: 416-262-6640
Fax: 647-689-2186
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

YWCA Toronto
80 Woodland Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4T 1C1
Canada
Phone: 416-923-8554
Fax: 416-923-1950
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Suite 206
1315 Finch Avenue West
North York ON  M3J 2G6
Canada
Phone: 647-856-6463
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Care Group,Lakehead Psychiatric Hospital Thunder Bay
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BERTHA CAROLINA ROXANA BEATRIZ VIDAL PERALTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VIDAL PERALTA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2006
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Sep 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2008