Vijayaratnam, Visvalingam (CPSO#: 54599)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Sri Lanka, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rosedale Medical Centre
600 Sherbourne Street
Unit 711
Toronto ON  M4X 1W4
Phone: (416) 929-0929
Fax: (416) 929-8084
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit 6A
3430 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1W 2R5
Canada
Phone: (416) 496-1990
Fax: (416) 496-1984
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: V. Vijayaratnam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Vijayaratnam ( CPSO# 54599 )

Business Address:
6A - 3430 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1W 2R5
Phone Number: (416) 496-1990

Business Address:
Rosedale Medical Centre
711 - 600 Sherbourne Street
Toronto ON  M4X 1W4
Phone Number: (416) 929-0929

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 25 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 28 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VISVALINGAM VIJAYARATNAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VIJAYARATNAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1996