Villar, Giselle Christine Pawlowski (CPSO#: 77012)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:Universidade Federal de Sao Paulo, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Giselle Villar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 3 2008

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Apr 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2001 to 31 Aug 2002
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2002 to 28 Feb 2003
International Specialist Physician - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Apr 2003
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 13 Apr 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 13 Apr 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jul 2008