Villeneuve, Pierre (CPSO#: 80920)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pierre Villeneuve Medecine Societe Professionnelle

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 12 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Villeneuve ( CPSO# 80920 )

Business Address:
College Square Medical Centre
1980 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2C 0C6
Phone Number: (613) 854-6147

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
501 Smyth Road, PO Box 704
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 16 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PIERRE VILLENEUVE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VILLENEUVE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 27 May 2011
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2008