Vilos, Angelos George Christos (CPSO#: 87130)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Oct 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Meharry Medical College, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Fertility Clinic, LHSC, VH
800 Commissioners Road
Zone E, E3-622
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 646-6104
Fax: (519) 646-6345
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. AG Vilos Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 15 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Vilos ( CPSO# 87130 )

Business Address:
The Fertility Clinic
LHSC - Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 646-6104

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANGELOS GEORGE CHRISTOS VILOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VILOS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2012