Vora, Parag Kanaiyalal (CPSO#: 81610)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 02 Aug 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Bombay, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
HHS McMaster Univ Medical Centre
Room 2S 28, Department of Radiology
PO Box 2000
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vora Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 09 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Vora ( CPSO# 84198 )
Dr. P. Vora ( CPSO# 81610 )

Business Address:
Stonechurch Family Health Centre
1475 Upper Ottawa
Hamilton ON  L8W 3J6
Phone Number: (905) 575-1300

Business Address:
Department of Radiology
HHS - McMaster University Medical Centre
2S28 - 1200 Main Street
P O Box 2000
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 26 May 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 10 Sep 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 11 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Feb 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 02 Aug 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee Effective: 02 Aug 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from 12:01 a.m., August 2, 2017, by order of the Inquiries, Complaints and
            Reports Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the
            following terms, conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of
            registration held by Dr. Parag Kanaiyalal Vora:

            Practice Monitor and Patient Log

            (i)   Dr. Vora shall not engage in any professional encounter, in person or
                  otherwise (the "Professional Encounter") with patients of any age in any
                  jurisdiction, unless the Professional Encounter takes place in the
                  continuous presence of and under the continuous observation of a monitor
                  who is a regulated health professional acceptable to the College (the
                  "Practice Monitor"), and unless the other requirements provided in this
                  Order are fulfilled. For further clarity, Dr. Vora may not be alone with
                  any patient, for any length of time, during any Professional Encounter,
                  whether or not the parent or guardian of the patient is also present. 

            (ii)  At all times, Dr. Vora shall ensure that the Practice Monitor shall:

                  (a)   Provide reports (as described in the Practice Monitor's
                        undertaking) to the College on at least a monthly basis; 
                  
                  (b)   Remain present at all times during all Professional Encounters with
                        all patients;
                  
                  (c)   Carefully observe all of Dr. Vora's Professional Encounters with
                        patients including, but not limited to, physical and internal
                        examinations.  It is Dr. Vora's obligation to ensure that the
                        Practice Monitor's view of all of his Professional Encounters with
                        patients, including physical and internal examinations, is
                        unobstructed at all times;  
                  
                  (d)   Refrain from performing other functions, except those required in
                        the Practice Monitor's undertaking attached as Appendix "B", while
                        observing Dr. Vora in all his Professional Encounters with
                        patients;
                  
                  (e)   Maintain a log of all Professional Encounters with patients in the
                        form attached as Appendix "C" (the "Log");
                  
                  (f)   Initial all corresponding entries in the records of patients noted
                        in the Log; and
                  
                  (g)   Submit the original Log to the College on a monthly basis.
                  
            (iii) Dr. Vora shall maintain a copy of the Log at all times, and shall make it
                  available to the College upon request.

            Notification of Practice Locations

            (iv)  Dr. Vora shall inform the College of each and every location that he
                  practices or has privileges including, but not limited to, hospital(s),
                  clinic(s) and office(s), in any jurisdiction (collectively the "Practice
                  Location(s)"), within five (5) days of this Order. Going forward, he
                  shall inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within
                  five (5) days of commencing practice at that location;

            Posting a Sign and Translations

            (v)   Dr. Vora shall post a sign in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and
                  consulting rooms, in all of his Practice Locations, in a clearly visible
                  and secure location, in the form attached hereto as Appendix "D" that
                  states: "Dr. Parag Kanaiyalal Vora must not have professional encounters,
                  in person or otherwise, with patients, of any age, unless in the
                  continuous presence of and under the continuous observation of a practice
                  monitor acceptable to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario.
                  Dr. Vora must not be alone during any professional encounter with any
                  patient. Further information may be found on the College website at
                  www.cpso.on.ca." 

            (vi)  Dr. Vora shall post a certified translation(s) in any language(s) in
                  which he provides services, of the sign described in (v) above, in all
                  waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all of his
                  Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form
                  attached hereto as Appendix "D".

            (vii) Dr. Vora shall provide the certified translation(s) described in (vi)
                  above to the College within 30 days of the date of this Order;

            Notifying Patients

            (viii)Dr. Vora shall ensure that each patient with whom he has a Professional
                  Encounter is directly notified, prior to the Professional Encounter, of
                  the details of the restriction described in (i), above. 

            (ix)  With respect to patients that are scheduled at least seven (7) days in
                  advance, Dr. Vora shall ensure that each patient is directly notified,
                  within seven (7) days after the appointment is scheduled, of the details
                  of the restriction described in (i) above.

            Monitoring

            (x)   Dr. Vora shall consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of
                  the Ontario Health Insurance Plan and/or any person or institution who
                  may have relevant information in order for the College to monitor Dr.
                  Vora's compliance with the terms of this Order and shall promptly sign
                  such consents as may be necessary for the College to obtain information
                  from these persons or institutions;

            (xi)  Dr. Vora shall submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections
                  of his Practice Locations and to inspections of patient charts by the
                  College and to any other activity the College deems necessary in order to
                  monitor Dr. Vora's compliance with the terms of this Order;

            (xii) Dr. Vora shall consent to the College providing any and all information
                  to the Practice Monitor that the College deems necessary or desirable in
                  order to assist the Practice Monitor in fulfilling their Undertaking and
                  in order to monitor Dr. Vora's compliance with the terms of this Order;

            (xiii)Dr. Vora shall consent to all Practice Monitors to disclose to the
                  College, and to one another, any information relevant to this Order,
                  relevant to the terms of the Practice Monitor's Undertaking and/or
                  relevant for the purposes of monitoring Dr. Vora's compliance with this
                  Order; and

            (xiv) Dr. Vora shall consent to the College providing the Order to any Chief(s)
                  of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice
                  Location where he practices or has privileges ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and
                  to provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has
                  that led to this Order and/or any information arising from the monitoring
                  of his compliance with this Order.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: October 21, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Criminal Charges:

Effective May 29, 2015, where a member has been charged with an offence under the Criminal Code of Canada or the Ontario Health Insurance Act and the charge is outstanding and is known to the College, the College By-laws require certain information about the charge to be posted on the register.

The following are outstanding charges against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

It is alleged that Parag Vora:

(1) on or between February 1, 2009 and February 28, 2009 at the City of Hamilton did sexually assault XX contrary to Section 271 of the Criminal Code of Canada; and

(2) on or between March 1, 2009 and March 30, 2009 at the City of Hamilton did sexually assault XX contrary to Section 271 of the Criminal Code of Canada.

(3) on or about August 11, 2014 at the City of Hamilton did sexually assault YY, contrary to Section 271 of the Criminal Code of Canada;

Date of charge: October 25, 2016
Place of charge: Hamilton, Ontario
Hamilton Police Service


Source: Member
Active Date: October 21, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Bail Conditions:

Effective December 4, 2014, the College By-laws require members to report to the College any currently existing conditions of release (“bail conditions”) following a charge for a criminal or provincial offence or subsequent to a finding of guilt and pending appeal. The following are conditions of release made against this member that relate to this member’s practice of medicine:

[September 28, 2016]
-Dr. Vora shall have no professional encounters with any patients
-When discharging professional duties (ie. Interpreting diagnostic tests), Dr. Vora shall not be alone with any female co-worker or staff person
-Dr. Vora must notify his employer, including all hospitals, out of hospital premises and any and all work places of the conditions of this bail upon return to work