Vorster, Sarel (CPSO#: 81114)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Pretoria, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
14 - 65 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 5N7
Phone: (705) 324-6061
Fax: (705) 324-2155
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Department of Family Medicine
Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Canada
Phone: (705) 324-6111
Fax: (705) 328-2817
County: County of Victoria
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sarel Vorster Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Vorster ( CPSO# 81114 )

Business Address:
14 - 65 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 5N7
Phone Number: (705) 324-4806

Business Address:
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 5N7
Phone Number: (705) 324-6111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAREL VORSTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VORSTER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Jun 2004
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jun 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 11 Jun 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Jul 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2005