Vozoris, Nicholas Theodore (CPSO#: 81056)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
Division Of Respirology
6th Floor
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-6026
Fax: (416) 864-5649
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Sleep and Pulmonary Centre
1011-123 Edward Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Canada
Phone: (416) 813-2277
Fax: (416) 260-3202
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Canada
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 06 Oct 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICHOLAS THEODORE VOZORIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VOZORIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2008