Vukovic, Milorad (CPSO#: 82353)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Aug 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Croatian, English, Serbian

Education:University of Sarajevo, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Shoniker Clinic
2877A Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4C1
Phone: (416) 281-7301
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Vukovic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 11 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Vukovic ( CPSO# 82353 )

Business Address:
The Shoniker Clinic
2877A Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4C1
Phone Number: (416) 281-7301

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MILORAD VUKOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VUKOVIC is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Apr 2005
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Apr 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Apr 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2006