Vyvey, Melissa Lynn (CPSO#: 90935)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Somerset West CHC
55 Eccles Street
Ottawa ON  K1R 6S3
Phone: (613) 238-1220
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

University of Ottawa
Faculty of Medicine
Roger Guindon Hall
451 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H8M5
Canada
Phone: 613-562-5800
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

The Foundation for Medical Practice
Education
1280 Main St. West , DBHSC, Room 40
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Canada
Phone: (905) 525-9140 Ext. 22219
Fax: (905) 540-4988
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELISSA LYNN VYVEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VYVEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2012