Walsh, Allyn Elizabeth (CPSO#: 30726)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Oct 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Oczkowski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 05 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Walsh ( CPSO# 30726 )
Dr. W. Oczkowski ( CPSO# 51298 )

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1978 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 01 Oct 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 01 Oct 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from October 1, 2018, the following is imposed as terms, conditions and
            limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Allyn Elizabeth
            Walsh  in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Walsh to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. ALLYN ELIZABETH WALSH
                                          ("Dr. Walsh")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended;
                  
                  "CPD" means continuing professional development;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public. 
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Walsh, certificate of registration number 30726, am a member of
                  the College. I acknowledge that the College has inquired into my
                  compliance with the requirement to participate in a program of CPD.    

            (3)   I, Dr. Walsh, have ceased to practise medicine due to retirement and I am
                  entering into this Undertaking as an alternative to complying with the
                  CPD requirement under section 29 of Ontario Regulation 114/94 (made under
                  the Medicine Act, 1991). 

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Walsh, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (5)   I, Dr. Walsh, undertake that, effective immediately, I will not practise
                  medicine in any jurisdiction until each and every one of the following
                  conditions have been met:


                  (a)   I provide a minimum of forty-five (45) days' notice to the College
                        of my intent to return to the practice of medicine; 
                  
                  (b)   I provide the College with proof that I am participating in a
                        program of CPD that meets the requirements for CPD of the Royal
                        College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada, the College of Family
                        Physicians of Canada, or an organization that has been approved by
                        the College for that purpose that meets the requirements for CPD
                        set by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or
                        the College of Family Physicians of Canada; and
                  
                  (c)   The College approves my return to the practice of medicine.
                  
            (6)   I, Dr. Walsh, undertake that upon signing this Undertaking I shall
                  forward a request to the General Manager of OHIP that my billing number
                  be deactivated for services rendered after the date I cease to practise
                  and before the date the College agrees that I may return to practise in
                  accordance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (7)   I, Dr. Walsh, undertake to abide by the College's Policy on Practice
                  Management Considerations for Physicians Who Cease to Practise, Take an
                  Extended Leave of Absence or Close Their Practice Due to Relocation, a
                  copy of which is attached hereto as Appendix "A". 

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENTS

            (8)   I, Dr. Walsh, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (9)   I, Dr.  Walsh, acknowledge that in considering my request to return to
                  practice, the College may, among other things:

                  (a)   request that I agree to specified terms, limitations or conditions
                        being placed upon my certificate of registration; and
                  
                  (b)   request that I enter into an appropriate assessment and/or
                        monitoring agreement with the College.
                  
            (10)  I, Dr. Walsh, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment
                  of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (11)  I, Dr. Walsh, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (12)  I, Dr. Walsh, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (13)  I, Dr. Walsh, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code.

            (14)  Public Register

            (a)   I, Dr. Walsh, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                  Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the
                  Public Register.

            (b)   I, Dr. Walsh, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being
                  posted in accordance with section (14)(a) above, the following summary
                  shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this
                  Undertaking remains in effect:

                        Dr. Walsh has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in any
                        jurisdiction and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any
                        medical advice or services.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (15)  I, Dr. Walsh, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP and any person who or institution that may
                  have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                  compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (16)  I, Dr. Walsh, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
                  attached hereto as Appendix "B" and that the consent forms part of this
                  Undertaking.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: October 1, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Allyn Elizabeth Walsh to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 1, 2018:

Dr. Walsh has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in any jurisdiction and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.