Wang, Chengning (CPSO#: 90490)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:Sun Yat Sen University of medical Scienc, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-1212
Fax: 9058832213
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chengning Wang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 28 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Wang ( CPSO# 90490 )

Business Address:
Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHENGNING WANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2013