Wang, Zhan Tao (CPSO#: 93229)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Mar 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Mar 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Hospital, Room B1-147
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: 519-667-6584
Fax: 519-667-6581
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zhan Tao Wang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 07 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Wang ( CPSO# 93229 )

Business Address:
Victoria Hospital
Room B1 - 147
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZHAN TAO WANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2017