Wansbrough, Michael Counsel Thomas (CPSO#: 68721)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 May 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 May 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Wilderman Medical Clinic
8054 yonge street
Thornhill ON  L4J1W3
Phone: (905) 886-1212
Fax: 905 886 0248
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Wilderman Medical Clinic
8054 Yonge St
Thornhill ON  L4J 1W3
Canada
Phone: (905) 886-1212
Fax: (905) 886-0248
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wansbrough Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 19 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Wansbrough ( CPSO# 68721 )

Business Address:
Wilderman Medical Clinic
8054 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON  M4V 1G2
Phone Number: (905) 886-1212

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 08 Dec 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL COUNSEL THOMAS WANSBROUGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WANSBROUGH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 May 1995