Wanzel, Kyle Robert (CPSO#: 72553)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 600
1243 Islington Avenue
Etobicoke ON  M8X 1Y9
Phone: (416) 236-2571
Fax: (416) 236-4591
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kyle Wanzel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 11 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Wanzel ( CPSO# 72553 )

Business Address:
600 - 1243 Islington Avenue
Toronto ON  M8X 1Y9
Phone Number: (416) 236-2571

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KYLE ROBERT WANZEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WANZEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 04 Aug 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005