Warsi, Mohammed Ali (CPSO#: 79488)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Healthcare
East Region Mental Health Services
2757 King Street East
Hamilton ON  L8G 5E4
Phone: 905 573 4801
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Niagara North Family Health Team
145 Carlton Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 1R5
Canada
Phone: (905) 988-9617 Ext. 226
Fax: (905) 988-0047
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Quest Comminity Health Centre
145 Queenston St
St Catharines ON  L2R 2Z7
Canada
Phone: (905) 688-2558
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Quest Comminity Health Centre
145 Queenston St
St Catharines ON  L2R 2Z7
Canada
Phone: (905) 688-2558
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Brock University Student Centre
Harrison Hall
500 Glenridge Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 3A1
Canada
Phone: (905) 547-3555
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Niagara Health System - SCS
Out Patient Mental Health and ECT
1200, 4th Ave
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Canada
Phone: (905) 378-4647 Ext. 49463
Fax: (905) 704-4420
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Imaging Research Center
St Josephs Healthcare
Room F 127, Fontbonne Building
301 James Street South
Hamilton ON  L8P 3B6
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. A. Warsi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 08 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Warsi ( CPSO# 79488 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Room F127, Imaging Research Centre
301 James Street South
Hamilton ON  L8P 3B6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
Unit 2, 2nd Floor
3550 Schmon Parkway
Thorold ON  L2V 4T7
Phone Number: (905) 688-2854

Business Address:
145 Carlton Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 1R5
Phone Number: (905) 988-9617

Business Address:
1200 4th Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
2757 King Street East
Hamilton ON  L8G 5E4
Phone Number: (905) 573-4801

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMMED ALI WARSI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WARSI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Clinician Investigator

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Clinician Investigator

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008