Waserman, Jessica Elizabeth (CPSO#: 93730)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Feb 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Healthcare Hamilton
West 5th Campus
Geriatrics Room D183
100 West 5th Street
Hamilton ON  L8N3K7
Phone: 9055221155
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alexander Rabinovich Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 13 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Waserman ( CPSO# 93730 )
Dr. A. Rabinovich ( CPSO# 80696 )

Business Address:
1508 Upper James Street
Hamilton ON  L9B 1K3
Phone Number: (905) 385-4261

Business Address:
114 - 50 Dundurn Street South
Hamilton ON  L8P 4W3
Phone Number: (289) 389-8181


Corporation Name: Jessica E. Waserman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 07 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Waserman ( CPSO# 93730 )

Business Address:
HHS McMaster University Medical Centre
Department of Psychiatry
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 525-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 20 Aug 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JESSICA ELIZABETH WASERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WASERMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 20 Aug 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Psychiatry

McMaster University, 21 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Geriatric Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 19 Feb 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Geriatric Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2018