Wassef, Anthony Wafik Aziz (CPSO#: 92703)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 May 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 May 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 210
430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Phone: 519-741-5252 Ext. 223
Fax: 519-741-5772
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anthony Wassef Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 29 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Wassef ( CPSO# 92703 )

Business Address:
911 Queens Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 744-3311

Business Address:
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 742-3611

Business Address:
564 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Phone Number: (519) 576-3099

Business Address:
206 - 430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Phone Number: (519) 741-5252

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 02 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTHONY WAFIK AZIZ WASSEF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WASSEF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 10 May 2010 to 04 Jun 2010
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jul 2010
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 May 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 May 2014