Waterston, Sarah Elizabeth (CPSO#: 86765)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Quinte Health Care Belleville
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone: 613-969-7400
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

403 Main St E
Picton ON  K0K 2T0
Canada
Phone: (613) 476-1008
County: County of Prince Edward
Electoral District: 06

274 Dundas Street East
Suite 303 & 305
Belleville, Ontario
K8N 1E6
Belleville ON  K8N 1E6
Canada
Phone: 613-779-7575
Fax: 613-779-8686
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sarah Waterston Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 20 2016


Corporation Name: Dr. Sarah Waterston Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 18 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Waterston ( CPSO# 86765 )

Business Address:
Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9

Business Address:
QHC Regional Pediatric Services
274 Dundas Street East
Suite 305
Belleville ON  K8N 1E6
Phone Number: (613) 779-7575

Business Address:
403 Main Street East
Picton ON  K0K 2T0
Phone Number: (613) 476-1008

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 31 Dec 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH ELIZABETH WATERSTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WATERSTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2017